IL HB0333 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if a minor has previously been placed on probation for an offense that involves the use or possession of a firearm, the court may not place the minor on probation for any subsequent offense involving the use or possession of a firearm. Provides that a minor convicted of a subsequent offense involving the use or possession of a firearm shall result in a mandatory sentence of no less than 6 months confinement to the Department of Juvenile Justice with the Department providing services including, but not limited to, education, mental health, drug treatment, and mentoring.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV-SUBSEQUENT FIREARM OFFENSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2020-01-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2020-01-28HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-11-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-10-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-10-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-10-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-10-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019
2019-10-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-19HouseTo Juvenile Justice and System Involved Youth Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-715Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-750Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback