IL HB0331 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Expressway Safety Act. Provides that the Illinois State Police, the Illinois Department of Transportation, and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority shall work together to conduct a program to increase the amount of cameras along expressways in Cook County. Provides that images from the cameras may be used to investigate offenses and detect roadway hazards, but not to enforce petty offenses. Provides that the program shall be funded by the Road Fund. Repeals the Act on July 1, 2023.
Title
EXPRESSWAY SAFETY ACT-CAMERAS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0042 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |