IL HB0330 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Creates the High School Interscholastic Association Commission as an executive agency of State government under the direction of the Governor to provide leadership for the development, supervision, and promotion of interscholastic competition and other activities; provides for the membership and powers and duties of the Commission. Provides that beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, no public school, nonpublic school, or charter school in this State with any of grades 9 through 12 may be a member of or pay any dues or fees to an association or other entity that has as one of its purposes promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among schools and students within this State other than the Commission. Provides that on or before July 1, 2021, and on or before each July 1 thereafter, the Auditor General must perform an audit of the Commission and on or before August 1, 2021, and on or before each August 1 thereafter, the Commission must submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the performance of the Commission that includes, but is not limited to, the results of the audit and information on any contracts entered into by the Commission in the previous year.
Title
INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC COMM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 25 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 25 | 1.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=330&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0330.htm |