IL HB0323 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals a Section providing authority to use automated traffic law enforcement systems at intersections in which cameras are used to photograph or video record a motor vehicle's failure to stop and yield as required by traffic control signals. Imposes limits on the power of local governments to use automated speed enforcement systems to provide recorded images of a motor vehicle for the purpose of recording its speed. Denies home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement from the State. Makes conforming and other technical changes.
Title
VEH CD-REPEAL REDLIGHT CAMERAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-11-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-10-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-105.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-208.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=323&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0323.htm |