IL HB0310 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if one or more committed persons in a Department of Corrections institution or facility injures or attempts to injure in a violent manner any employee, officer, guard, other peace officer or any other committed person or damages or attempts to damage any building or workshop, or any appurtenances thereof, or attempts to escape, or disobeys or resists any lawful command, the employees, officers, guards and other peace officers shall use all suitable means to defend other persons as well as themselves, to enforce the observance of discipline, to achieve a permitted purpose, to secure the persons of the offenders, and prevent such attempted violence or escape. Provides that use of force shall be terminated as soon as force is no longer necessary. Provides that corporal punishment is prohibited. Provides that use of chemical agents may be justified under the following circumstances: (1) when use of force is otherwise justified; (2) when lesser means are unavailable or inadequate; (3) when a committed person refuses to follow direct orders and verbalizes intent to resist the use of justified force to compel compliance with a lawful command; or (4) when a reasonable person would believe that a committed person is likely to resist the use of justified force to compel compliance with a lawful command. Provides that in a Department of Juvenile Justice facility, force shall be employed only to the degree reasonably necessary to defend oneself, another person, or to achieve a permitted purpose. Provides that use of force shall be terminated as soon as force is no longer necessary. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-OFFICER USE OF FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-10-8Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-6-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback