IL HB0306 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Jobs Creation Finance Act. Provides that municipalities may designate job creation areas. Provides that businesses that undertake job creation projects in those designated areas are eligible for certain tax incentives. Provides that municipalities may issue bonds in connection with those projects. Contains provisions concerning public hearings. Contains numerous other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
JOB CREATION-FINANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=306&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0306.htm |