IL HB0302 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Report Card Act. Requires hospitals to include in their quarterly reports additional infection measures mandated by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services that are reported by hospitals to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention's National Healthcare Safety Network surveillance system and deemed relevant to patient safety by the Department of Public Health. Provides that the Department may align the infection-related measures that are required to be reported by hospitals with the measures and methods developed by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, the Agency for Healthcare Research and Quality, the Joint Commission on Accreditation of Healthcare Organizations, and the National Quality Forum by adding and retiring reporting measures based on national health care strategies and measures deemed scientifically reliable and valid for public reporting.
Title
HOSPITALS-INFECTION REPORTING
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2015-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 86 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |