IL HB0302 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Any licensee under this Act who is subject to a hearing for allegedly violating a provision of this Act may waive his or her right to that hearing and shall not be required to appear before the Commission if, before the scheduled hearing date, the licensee (1) concedes that he or she violated the Act as alleged and (2) consents to any penalty and pays any fine to be imposed for the violation.
Title
LIQUOR - WAIVER OF HEARING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=302&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0302.htm |