IL HB0300 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person shall stand, sit, or stay on a street or roadway for the purpose of soliciting money from the occupant of any vehicle. A person convicted of violating the provision shall be guilty of a Class A misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SOLICITATION ON ROADWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-03SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-03-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-08SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-003-002
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-01-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1006Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback