IL HB0297 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. In provisions concerning impasse procedures, provides that for collective bargaining between the Chicago school district and an exclusive representative of educational employees who are forbidden from striking under the Act, educational employees who are forbidden from striking have the right to submit all negotiation disputes, including, but not limited to, mid-term disputes and impact bargaining disputes, for resolution through specified mandatory arbitration procedures. Makes other changes regarding educational employees who are forbidden from striking. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply only to collective bargaining agreements entered into, modified, extended, or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-040-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2023-03-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 13 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |