IL HB0291 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who holds part-time elective office is not a participating employee with respect to that office, unless he or she (i) was elected to that office before the effective date of the amendatory Act and (ii) has elected while in that office to become a contributor. Provides that an elective office shall be presumed to be part-time in the absence of an official job description or determination by the legal advisor of the applicable unit of local government, filed with the Board of the Fund every 4 years, declaring the elective office to be full-time.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-ELECTED OFFICIALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-01 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-01-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-01-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |