IL HB0291 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Allows an income tax credit for each individual taxpayer who is a teacher teaching in a school in Illinois. Provides that the amount of the credit is equal to the eligible classroom expenses made by the taxpayer during the taxable year, but the credit may not exceed $500. Defines "eligible classroom expenses" as the aggregate amount of nonreimbursed classroom expenses made by the taxpayer during the taxable year less $250. Provides that the credit may not be carried forward or back and may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CLASSROOM SUPPLY CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-24 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-22 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=291&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0291.htm |