IL HB0284 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Requires that the training of probationary and permanent police officers, including those of home rule units, include sensitivity training with regard to the African American male population of Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
POLICE-AFRICAN AMER SENSITIVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-07-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=284&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0284.htm |