IL HB0279 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Patient Rights Act. Provides that a hospital must include in its written statement of patients' rights the right not to be discriminated against by the hospital due to the patient's race, color, or national origin where such characteristics are not relevant to the patient's medical diagnosis and treatment, and that the statement should put the patient on notice on how to initiate a grievance with the hospital or with the Illinois Department of Public Health regarding improper discrimination. Sets forth discrimination grievance procedures and provides language all hospitals must post for the benefit of patients regarding the hospital's emergency room anti-discrimination policy. Effective immediately.
Title
MED PATIENT RT-DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0485 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2011 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2011 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Delgado |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2011 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee; 010-000-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 50 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 50 | 5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 50 | 5.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |