IL HB0277 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that any person who is required to register under the Act who harasses a victim or family member of a victim of the offense for which the sex offender is required to register under the Act is guilty of a Class 3 felony. Defines "harass".
Title
SEX OFFENDER-VICTIM HARASS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0468 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2011-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham |