IL HB0274 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a municipality, including a home rule unit, may not revoke, suspend, or refuse to renew a business license or otherwise interfere with a business license issued by the municipality to a business owner, including the holder of a retail liquor license issued under the Liquor Control Act of 1934, because the business owner lawfully permits a concealed carry licensee to carry firearms into his or her business establishment. Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEAL CARRY-BUSINESS LICENSE
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-02-19 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=274&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0274.htm |