IL HB0261 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Provides that applications for owners licenses shall be considered in accordance with the rules of the Illinois Gaming Board (deleting statutory deadlines for filing the applications). Makes changes in provisions concerning the determining factors in the Board's decision in granting owners licenses. Makes changes concerning the criteria for an occupational license. Provides that excursion cruises shall not exceed 4 hours for a round trip, but that the Board may grant express approval for an extended cruise on a case-by-case basis. Provides exceptions to the requirement that gambling equipment and supplies must be purchased or leased only from suppliers licensed under the Act. Provides that any winnings that are a result of a wager by a person under age 21 shall be treated as winnings for privilege tax purposes, confiscated, and forfeited to the State and deposited into the Education Assistance Fund. Provides that the privilege tax shall be paid to the Board not later than 5:00 (was 3:00) o'clock p.m. of the day after the day when the wagers were made. Requires that, within 90 days after the end of each quarter of each fiscal year, the licensed owner or manager shall transmit to the Board a compliance report on engagement procedures determined by the Board. Provides that a person under the age of 21 who enters upon a riverboat commits a petty offense and is subject to a fine. Makes changes concerning admission taxes. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RIVERBOAT GAMBLING-ADMIN
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Refuse to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Refuse to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Refuse to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Refuse to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 - May 27, 2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 | |
2009-05-26 | House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote; SA 1, 2, 3, 4 Motion #1 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #2 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Lou Lang; Motion #1 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 | |
2009-05-19 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 040-013-001 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Risinger | |
2009-05-19 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 007-000-000 | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Gaming | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass as Amended Gaming; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Gaming | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Gaming | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-31 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-045-000 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-26 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-005-000 | |
2009-03-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-17 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-16 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-10 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004 | |
2009-03-10 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |