IL HB0248 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that the court may declare null and void any final action taken at a closed or open meeting (instead of only a closed meeting) in violation of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-VOID ACTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-05-14 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2015-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |