IL HB0243 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Creates the police training academy job training program. Requires any school district with a high school to establish a partnership with a local police department, county sheriff, or police training academy to establish a jobs training program for high school students. Provides that the program shall be open to all students regardless of academic history, but that school districts may impose requirements to maintain successful participation in the program. Requires the State Board of Education to track students participating in the programs. Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Creates the police training academy job training scholarship program. Provides that the Illinois Student Assistance Commission shall receive applications for scholarships from any applicant that has successfully completed the police training academy job training program and been accepted to any public institution of higher learning in the State. Provides that applicants who are determined to be eligible for the scholarship shall receive, subject to appropriation, a renewable scholarship to be applied to tuition and mandatory fees and paid directly to the public institution of higher learning at which the applicant is enrolled. Allows the Commission to establish by rule academic requirements to maintain access to the scholarship. Grants students who have received a scholarship access to any needed noncredit remedial courses in order to ensure academic success, as well as access to a student retention program offered by the public institution, including, but not limited to, CHANCE programs. Allows the Commission to make all necessary and proper rules needed for the program.
Title
SCH-POLICE JOB TRAINING PROG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0331 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-003-001 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 091-007-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-07 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-006-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-15 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 009-009-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 947 | 65.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |