IL HB0242 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Lead in Schools Reporting Act. Provides that on an annual basis the Department of Public Health, in coordination with local departments of public health serving the City of Chicago, shall conduct specified lead testing at public school facilities within the City. Provides that the results from such testing shall be transmitted to the State Board of Education. Provides that the Department shall notify the Board if a detected lead level meets a level that the Department deems unsafe. Amends the School Code. Provides that school report cards for cities with populations in excess of 500,000 shall include lead testing results and that students in such districts may transfer from one attendance center to another attendance center within or outside of the district if any lead levels at his or her current attendance center meets a level that the Department deems unsafe. Makes other changes to provisions concerning transfers to specified attendance centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH REPORT CARD-LEAD-CHICAGO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-08-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-07-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-08HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-04-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-08HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-17aAmended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.24Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback