IL HB0235 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Provides that a violation of the Act involving the sale or distribution of single or loose cigarettes that are not contained within a sealed container, pack, or package to persons who are 18 years of age or older is a petty offense punishable by a fine of not more than $50, which may be satisfied without a court appearance by a written plea of guilty and payment of all applicable fines, penalties, and costs. Amends the Cigarette Tax Act and the Cigarette Use Tax Act to provide that those violations shall be subject only to the penalties provided in the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act.
Title
TOBACCO-SINGLE CIGARETTE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-14 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 130 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 135 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |