IL HB0233 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that aggravated battery that causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement is a Class X felony when the aggravated battery was intentional and involved the infliction of torture as the infliction of or subjection to extreme physical pain, motivated by an intent to increase or prolong the pain, suffering, or agony of the victim.
Title
CRIM CD-AGG BATTERY-TORTURE
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cross [R] | Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0467 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Cross |
2011-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 005-000-000 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |