IL HB0232 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that if a company ceases activity that designates the company to be a for-profit company that contracts to shelter migrant children, the company shall be removed from the list of restricted companies. Provides that a retirement system shall adhere to specified procedures for restricted companies that are for-profit companies that contract to shelter migrant children. Provides that if, at least 4 years after the effective date of an amendatory Act that initially establishes a prohibited transaction under this Article, the Illinois Investment Policy Board concludes that divestment is no longer necessary due to achievement of the underlying goals of the amendatory Act establishing the prohibited transaction, changes in status surrounding the prohibited transactions, or other verifiable reasons, the Illinois Investment Policy Board may cease actions to require divestment, identify restricted companies, or prohibit transactions by a majority vote of the Illinois Investment Policy Board if: (1) no less than one year prior to the change in policy, the Illinois Investment Policy Board notifies, in writing, the General Assembly of the change in policy and lists the reasons for changing the policy; and (2) the General Assembly does not, before the change in policy, adopt a House Resolution or a Senate Resolution instructing the Illinois Investment Policy Board to not change the policy. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-PROHIBITED TRANSACTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0118
2021-07-23HouseEffective Date July 23, 2021
2021-07-23HouseGovernor Approved
2021-06-25HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-28HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Pensions; 006-000-000
2021-05-12SenatePostponed - Pensions
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Pensions
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-005-000
2021-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-22HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000
2021-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-110.16Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback