IL HB0222 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue special registration plates designated as Defense Superior Service license plates to Illinois residents who have been awarded the Defense Superior Service Medal. Provides that no registration fee shall be charged for the issuance or renewal of a Defense Superior Service plate.
Title
DEFENSE SUPERIOR SERVICE PLATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |