IL HB0204 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to reimburse advanced practice nurses for psychiatric services they provide to Medicaid recipients pursuant to a collaborative agreement with a collaborating physician that authorizes the provision of psychiatric services. Effective immediately.
Title
HFS-MEDICAID-NURSE-PSYCHIATRIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-21 | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto | |
2009-10-05 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-02-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 25, 2009 | |
2009-02-20 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-02-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-14 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |