IL HB0195 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning PPV leases, provides that the current method of classifying and valuing PPV leases expires on the earlier of (i) January 1, 2056 or (ii) January 1 of the calendar year in which the particular PPV lease terminates (now, January 1, 2016). Provides that, for naval training facilities, naval bases, and naval support facilities, "net operating income" means all revenues received minus the lesser of (i) 42% of all revenues or (ii) actual expenses before interest, taxes, depreciation, and amortization (now, all revenues received minus the lesser of (i) 62% of all revenues or (ii) actual expenses before interest, taxes, depreciation, and amortization). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-PPV LEASES
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Drury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 10-370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 10-380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=195&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0195.htm |