IL HB0190 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, each school district must provide a parent or guardian of an at-risk student information about appropriate and available community-based or in-school academic support services; defines "at-risk student" and specifies what those services may include. Provides that a school district shall not be responsible for any costs or transportation associated with a student's participation in community-based academic support services. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-ACADEMIC SUPPORT
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-022-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |