IL HB0180 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board, police training schools approved by the Board, law enforcement agencies, and units of local government may not initiate, administer, or conduct training programs that include warrior-style training, either directly or through a third party. Provides that the Board may not reimburse a law enforcement agency or unit of local government for any portion of training programs that include warrior-style training. Provides that law enforcement agencies and units of local government may not indemnify or otherwise provide liability protection for a peace officer for liability arising from the use of tactics derived from warrior-style training. Defines "warrior-style" training. Preempts home rule. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WARRIOR-STYLE TRAINING BANNED

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-56New CodeSee Bill Text
507057.1New CodeSee Bill Text
507058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback