IL HB0167 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In a provision concerning school safety and security grants, allows a law enforcement agency that provides a school resource officer to a public school to be awarded a grant (to be used exclusively to defray the costs related to providing a school resource officer to a school located within a Tier 1 or Tier 2 school district). Allows grant funds to be used to defray the costs associated with hiring a school resource officer, with the State Board of Education prioritizing estimated law enforcement response time in awarding grant funds for such a purpose. Requires the State Board to annually disseminate a request for grant applications, requires grant funds to be distributed annually, and permits the State Board to adopt rules. In a provision concerning school resource officers, changes how "school resource officer" is defined. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SECURITY GRANTS-SRO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-01-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=167&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0167.htm |