IL HB0165 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, on or after July 1, 2013 and on or before December 31, 2018, the taxes imposed under the Acts apply to (i) 90% of the proceeds of sales of gasohol, (ii) 80% of the proceeds of sales of E20 blended ethanol fuel, and (iii) 60% of the proceeds of sales of E30 blended ethanol fuel. Amends the Illinois Renewable Fuels Development Program Act. Provides that grants may be awarded for the following programs: a next generation renewable fuels program, a majority blended ethanol and blender pump infrastructure program, and a research and development program for sustainable corn production and corn-based renewable fuel production. Sets forth the maximum aggregate amount of grants that may be awarded under each program. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-GASOHOL
Sponsors
Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 689 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 689 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=165&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0165.htm |