IL HB0153 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall provide educational programs in each of its institutions and facilities for all committed persons. Provides that the Department must allow into each institution and facility of the Department teachers who hold Professional Educator Licenses issued by the State Superintendent of Education under the School Code to teach committed persons. Provides that the Department shall provide vocational training for committed persons in each institution and facility of the Department. Provides that each institution and facility of the Department of Juvenile Justice shall provide educational and vocational training for all persons committed to the Department. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-JOB TRAINING AND EDUCA
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-10-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-6-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=153&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0153.htm |