IL HB0150 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the 21st Century Scholars Act to provide an incentive for low-income students in the 8th grade to improve their academic preparation for postsecondary education. Sets forth provisions concerning annual tuition scholarships to applicants who qualify; requiring the State, the participating school district, and the student to enter into a 3-part compact; rules to implement the Act; and reporting to the General Assembly on awards.
Title
21ST CENTURY SCHOLARS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-001-004 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-04-22 | Re-assigned to Executive | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-01 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Higher Education | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 26, 2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-24 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-02-20 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-12 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller |