IL HB0128 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Repeals the Family Responsibility Fund. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Removes driver's licenses from the licenses that may be suspended for failure to respond to a subpoena or warrant regarding paternity or for failure to make timely support payments. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes the prohibition on issuance of a driver's license to persons that are delinquent in making support payments and limits the prohibition on issuance of a driver's license to persons that have not posted security or proof of financial responsibility to those persons who have failed to do so in connection with the requirements of Chapter 7 of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals the Family Financial Responsibility Law. Amends the Marriage and Dissolution Act and the Non-Support Punishment Act. Prohibits the suspension of a driver's license for visitation abuse or delinquency of court ordered support payments.
Title
ISSUANCE/SUSPENSION OF DL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Remains in Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary; 005-009-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary; 003-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | To General Law Subcommittee |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=128&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0128.htm |