IL HB0124 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Records Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-04-29SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-03-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback