IL HB0122 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Insurance
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-033-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-04-11HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-005-000
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51001-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback