IL HB0115 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services shall charge the employing State agency for workers' compensation payments for medical expenses and temporary total disability benefits (now, just for temporary total disability) paid to any employee (now, the Department shall charge the State agency only after the employee has received temporary total disability payments for 120 days if the employee's physician has issued a release to return to work but the employing State agency does not return the employee to work).
Title
CMS-DISABILITY BENEFITS
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Tabled |
2013-02-19 | House | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2013-02-05 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 64.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=115&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0115.htm |