IL HB0089 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if the total equalized assessed value of all taxable property in the taxing district for the current levy year (excluding new property, recovered tax increment value, and property that is annexed to or disconnected from the taxing district in the current levy year) is less than the total equalized assessed value of all taxable property in the taxing district for the previous levy year, then the extension limitation is (a) 0% or (b) the rate of increase approved by voters (instead of the lesser of 5% or the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index during the 12-month calendar year preceding the levy year or (b) the rate of increase approved by voters). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-FALLING EAV
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 43 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2013-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 043-065-001 |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2013-04-08 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2013-04-08 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2013-03-22 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2013-03-22 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2013-03-22 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2013-03-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2013-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-03-21 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2013-03-21 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |