IL HB0088 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. In a Section granting a tax credit for residential real property taxes, provides that, for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2013, if the taxpayer qualifies for the disabled persons' homestead exemption under the Property Tax Code, then the taxpayer is entitled to a credit equal to 10% (instead of 5%) of real property taxes paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year on the qualifying property. Provides that the credit may not be carried forward or back and may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero. Exempts the credit from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-PROP TX CREDIT-DISABLED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=88&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0088.htm |