IL HB0077 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0436
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0436
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Flag Display Act. Requires that the U.S. national and Illinois State flags be displayed at half-staff when an Illinois firefighter is killed in the line of duty. Effective immediately.
Title
FLAG DISPLAY-FIREFIGHTER DEATH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0436 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date August 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 25, 2009 | |
2009-02-20 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-02-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-000-000 | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-09 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole |