IL HB0063 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish women's health clinics throughout the State to provide affordable health care for women. Requires the services provided at the women's health clinic to be offered at an affordable price and to include specified services, including women's health examinations, pregnancy confirmation, prenatal care, labor and delivery services, postpartum care, family planning examinations and birth control services, and care for sexually transmitted diseases and infections.
Title
IDPH-WOMEN'S HEALTH CLINICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=63&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0063.htm |