IL HB0059 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Redistricting Transparency and Public Participation Act. Creates the Independent Redistricting Commission to adopt and file with the Secretary of State a redistricting plan for Legislative and Representative Districts (rather than requiring the Senate and House of Representatives to each establish a committee, or the Senate and House of Representatives may create by joint resolution a joint committee of both chambers, to consider proposals to redistrict the Legislative Districts or Representative Districts). Provides the commissioner selection process and meeting and voting requirements to adopt a plan. Makes conforming changes in the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REDISTRICTING-COMMISSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2021-02-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-01-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-01-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012510-10New CodeSee Bill Text
1012510-5Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback