IL HB0057 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the requirements to change a candidate's name do not apply to name changes resulting from a civil union to assume a spouse's surname or dissolution of a civil union or declaration of invalidity of a civil union to assume a former surname or a name change that conforms the candidate's name to his or her gender identity. Makes conforming changes throughout the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTIONS-NAME CHANGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 16-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-10.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 8-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=57&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0057.htm |