IL HB0055 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Guardians For Adults With Disabilities Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Changes the definition of "developmental disability" to mean a disability that is attributable to an intellectual disability or a related condition. Defines "intellectual disability" and “related condition”. Provides that, in the case of an intellectual disability, the required report for a petition for adjudication of disability and for appointment of a guardian shall include a psychological evaluation of the respondent that has been performed by a clinical psychologist within one year of the date of the filing of the petition. Makes a corresponding change.
Title
PROBATE-REPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0109 |
2021-07-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-001-001 |
2021-03-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11a-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11a-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |