IL HB0046 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in a Section regarding the place of trial.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |