IL HB0040 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-4)
Status: Passed on July 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that a student whose 22nd birthday occurs during the school year is eligible for special education services through the end of the school year (rather than being eligible for services only until the day before his or her 22nd birthday). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-MAXIMUM AGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-28HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0172
2021-07-28HouseEffective Date July 28, 2021
2021-07-28HouseGovernor Approved
2021-06-25HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-28HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
2021-05-13SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
2021-05-12SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2021-05-05SenatePostponed - Education
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-04-28SenateAssigned to Education
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-15SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-15SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-04-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-009-003
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2021-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-03-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-02HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-001-000
2021-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2021-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2021-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2021-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-01-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-01-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-1.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback