IL HB0029 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Limits the concurrent exercise by units of local government of powers and functions exercised by the State with respect to amendments to the community instruments and accounting practices. Amends the Condominium Property Act. Limits the concurrent exercise by units of local government of powers and functions exercised by the State with respect to an association's: budgeting practices; sale of property; notice requirements; contracts with board members; voting procedures; property improvement procedures; accounting practices; collection and sharing of records; amendment to the condominium instruments; and subdivision or combination of units. Effective immediately.
Title
CONDO/CICA ACT-HOME RULE LIMIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-02-14 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-02-08 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-30 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 605 | 18.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |