IL HB0020 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - To Wage Policy and Study Subcommittee
Pending: House Wage Policy and Study Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Increases the minimum wage to $15 per hour on October 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MIN WAGE-$15 PER HOUR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseTo Wage Policy and Study Subcommittee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback