IL HB0009 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Paid Family Leave Act. Requires private employers with 50 or more employees to provide 6 weeks of paid leave for an employee who takes leave: (1) because of the birth of a child of the employee and in order to care for the child; (2) to care for a newly adopted child under 18 years of age or a newly placed foster child under 18 years of age or a newly adopted or newly placed foster child older than 18 years of age if the child is incapable of self-care because of a mental or physical disability; or (3) to care for a family member with a serious health condition. Provides that paid family leave shall be provided irrespective of the employer's leave policies; and shall be provided to an employee who has been employed by the employer for at least one year. Permits employees to voluntarily waive paid family leave. Provides that the Department of Labor may adopt any rules necessary to implement the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAID MATERNITY LEAVE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-13HouseTo Workforce Development Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-30HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback