IL HB0007 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Changes the name to the Efficient School District Commission (instead of the School District Efficiency Commission). Makes changes to the membership of the Commission. Requires the Commission to provide recommendations to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the electorate (rather than make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly). Makes changes concerning the Commission's recommendations. Provides that, on or before May 1, 2022 (rather than May 1, 2024), the Commission must vote on its recommendations (rather than recommended propositions). Requires the Commission to adopt the recommendations (rather than report) by an affirmative vote of at least 13 (rather than 11) of its members. Changes provisions relating to notice. Removes provisions relating to administrative review. Provides for repeal on January 31, 2025 (rather than January 31, 2023). Makes other changes, including with respect to incentive payments. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH DISTRICT EFFICIENCY COMM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-04-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 042-055-003 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 11E-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 11E-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |