IL HB0001 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Compassionate Use and Research of Entheogens Act. Establishes the Illinois Psilocybin Advisory Board within the Department of Public Health for the purpose of advising and making recommendations to the Department regarding the provision of psilocybin and psilocybin services. Provides that the Department shall begin receiving applications for the licensing of persons to manufacture or test psilocybin products, operate service centers, or facilitate psilocybin services. Contains licensure requirements and prohibitions. Provides that a licensee or licensee representative may manufacture, deliver, or possess a psilocybin product. Provides that the Department may obtain, relinquish, or dispose of psilocybin products to ensure compliance with and enforce the Act and rules adopted under the Act. Creates the Psilocybin Control and Regulation Fund and the Illinois Psilocybin Fund and makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act. Requires the Department of Agriculture, the Illinois Liquor Control Commission, and the Department of Revenue to perform specified duties. Contains provisions concerning rulemaking; taxes; fees; zoning; labeling; and penalties. Preempts home rule powers. Contains other provisions. Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that specified records shall be expunged prior to (i) January 1, 2024 (rather than January 1, 2023) and (ii) January 1, 2026 (rather than January 1, 2025). Provides for expungement of specified records concerning the possession of psilocybin and psilocin. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Removes psilocybin and psilocin from the list of Schedule I controlled substances. Amends the Illinois Independent Tax Tribunal Act of 2012. Provides that the Tax Tribunal shall have original jurisdiction over all determinations of the Department of Revenue reflected on specified notices issued under the Compassionate Use and Research of Entheogens Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS CURE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2024-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2024-02-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2024-01-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2023-12-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
2023-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2023-03-14HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2023-03-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-10HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2023-03-09HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2023-03-08HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2023-03-08HouseJudicial Note Filed
2023-03-07HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2023-03-07HousePension Note Filed
2023-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2023-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
2023-02-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HousePension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2023-02-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2023-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-12HouseFirst Reading
2022-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.990New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.991New CodeSee Bill Text
3510101-45Amended CodeCitation Text
720570102Amended CodeCitation Text
720570204Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback